IL HB2471 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Property Tax Code. Provides a taxpayer qualifying to receive the homestead exemption for veterans with disabilities is entitled to a refund of State income taxes in the amount of the exemption, if no exemption was granted to the taxpayer during the year of purchase of the qualified residence. Provides that a taxpayer qualifying to receive the homestead exemption for veterans with disabilities shall be automatically granted the exemption in future years without reapplying. Effective immediately.
Title
PROP TAX-VETERANS EXEMPTION
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2017-03-31 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-09 | House | To Property Tax Subcommittee |
2017-02-22 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2017-02-08 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-08 | House | First Reading |
2017-02-07 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Allen Skillicorn |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
35 | 200 | 15-169 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2471&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB2471.htm |