IL HB2470 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 29 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-05-29 - Passed Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Chicago Police Article of the Illinois Pension Code. Provides that if any policeman whose application for either a duty disability benefit or an occupational disease disability benefit has been denied by the Retirement Board brings an action for administrative review challenging the denial of disability benefits and the policeman prevails in the action in administrative review, then the prevailing policeman shall be entitled to recover from the Fund court costs and litigation expenses, including reasonable attorney's fees, as part of the costs of the action.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

PEN CD-CHI POLICE-ADMIN REVIEW

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-29 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 94 N: 18 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 50 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 66 N: 43 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-29HousePassed Both Houses
2019-05-29HouseHouse Concurs
2019-05-29HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 094-018-000
2019-05-27HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Personnel & Pensions Committee; 007-000-000
2019-05-26HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Personnel & Pensions Committee
2019-05-24HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
2019-05-24HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Kelly M. Burke
2019-05-23HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1
2019-05-23HouseArrived in House
2019-05-23SenateThird Reading - Passed; 050-008-000
2019-05-23SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2019-05-23SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Cunningham
2019-05-23SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2019-05-23SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt State Government; 006-002-000
2019-05-21SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 22, 2019
2019-05-21SenateSecond Reading
2019-05-21SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to State Government
2019-05-16SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2019-05-16SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Bill Cunningham
2019-05-15SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 16, 2019
2019-05-15SenateDo Pass State Government; 007-002-000
2019-05-10SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 17, 2019
2019-05-09SenatePostponed - State Government
2019-05-01SenatePostponed - State Government
2019-04-24SenateAssigned to State Government
2019-04-04SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-04-04SenateFirst Reading
2019-04-04SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham
2019-04-04SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2019-04-04SenateArrive in Senate
2019-04-04HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley
2019-04-04HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 066-043-001
2019-03-26HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2019-03-26HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2019-03-07HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2019-03-07HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Personnel & Pensions Committee; 006-004-000
2019-02-26HouseAssigned to Personnel & Pensions Committee
2019-02-13HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-02-13HouseFirst Reading
2019-02-13HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Kelly M. Burke

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
308058.43New CodeSee Bill Text
4055-228Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback