IL HB2470 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-5)
Status: Passed on June 30 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-30 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0008
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-5)
Status: Passed on June 30 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-30 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0008
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Educator Licensure Article of the School Code. Provides that a career and technical educator or a part-time provisional career and technical educator endorsement may be issued to an applicant who, among other requirements, has a minimum of 60 semester hours of coursework from a regionally accredited institution of higher education or an accredited trade and technical institution (rather than just a regionally accredited institution of higher education). Allows individuals seeking these endorsements to pass a test of basic skills or a test of work proficiency. Allows individuals holding a provisional career and technical educator endorsement to renew their endorsement more than one time. Reduces the semester hour requirement for a provisional career and technical educator endorsement from 20 to 15. Effective July 1, 2017.
Title
SCH CD-TECHNICAL EDUCATOR TEST
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-19 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-30 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0008 |
2017-06-30 | House | Effective Date July 1, 2017 |
2017-06-30 | House | Governor Approved |
2017-06-16 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2017-05-19 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 053-000-000 |
2017-05-15 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 16, 2017 |
2017-05-15 | Senate | Second Reading |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 4, 2017 |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Do Pass Education; 009-000-000 |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Assigned to Education |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-03-30 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading March 30, 2017 |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2017-03-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin |
2017-03-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Cynthia Soto |
2017-03-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Sente |
2017-03-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel V. Beiser |
2017-03-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2017-03-29 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 114-000-000 |
2017-03-23 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-23 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jeanne M Ives |
2017-03-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer |
2017-03-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David S. Olsen |
2017-03-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2017-03-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John Cavaletto |
2017-03-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2017-03-15 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-15 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing, Administration & Oversight; 009-000-000 |
2017-03-15 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing, Administration & Oversight; by Voice Vote |
2017-03-13 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing, Administration & Oversight |
2017-03-09 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II |
2017-03-09 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert W. Pritchard |
2017-03-08 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-08 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr. |
2017-02-22 | House | Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing, Administration & Oversight |
2017-02-08 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-08 | House | First Reading |
2017-02-07 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 5 | 21B-20 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 21B-30 | Amended Code | Citation Text |