IL HB2466 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on January 7 2025 - 100% progression
Action: 2025-01-07 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Income Tax Act. Provides that a taxpayer who employs a person with a developmental disability or a severe mental illness, as certified by the Department of Human Services, during the taxable year is entitled to an income tax credit in an amount equal to 25% of the wages paid by the taxpayer to the person with a developmental disability or severe mental illness, but not to exceed $6,000 in wages paid during the taxable year to any single qualified employee. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

INC TX-EMPLOYMENT DISABILITIES

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2025-01-07HouseSession Sine Die
2024-04-05HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2024-03-08HouseTo Revenue-Income Tax Subcommittee
2024-01-31HouseAssigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
2024-01-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Faver Dias
2023-03-10HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2023-03-09HouseTo Revenue-Income Tax Subcommittee
2023-02-28HouseAssigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
2023-02-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Diane Blair-Sherlock
2023-02-27HouseRemove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Diane Blair-Sherlock
2023-02-27HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Diane Blair-Sherlock
2023-02-15HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2023-02-15HouseFirst Reading
2023-02-15HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Suzanne M. Ness

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
355234New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback