IL HB2466 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Grade A Pasteurized Milk and Milk Products Act. Provides that a specified pasteurization requirement shall not be applicable to milk produced, sold, and distributed (currently, to milk produced) in accordance with Department rules (removes language limiting the exemption to milk sold or distributed on the premises of the dairy farm). Effective immediately.
Title
PASTEURIZED MILK
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2017-03-31 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-31 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Demmer |
2017-03-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2017-03-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace |
2017-03-15 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel J. Burke |
2017-03-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Martwick |
2017-03-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert W. Pritchard |
2017-03-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
2017-03-13 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Consumer Protection Committee |
2017-03-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith R. Wheeler |
2017-03-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2017-03-10 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-10 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Peter Breen |
2017-03-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven A. Andersson |
2017-03-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed |
2017-02-22 | House | Assigned to Consumer Protection Committee |
2017-02-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Allen Skillicorn |
2017-02-08 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-08 | House | First Reading |
2017-02-07 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Peter Breen |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
410 | 635 | 8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |