IL HB2465 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-29 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-29 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Insurance Code. Provides that all managed care plans shall ensure that all claims and indemnities concerning health care services shall be paid within 30 days after receipt of a claim that has provided specified information on a CMS-1500 Health Insurance Claim Form or a UB-04 (CMS-1450) form. Provides that certain health care providers shall be notified of any known failure of the claim and provide detailed information on how the claim may be satisfied to receive payment within 30 days after receipt. Provides that any undisputed portions of a claim must be reimbursed by the managed care plan within 30 days after receipt. Grants the Department of Insurance specific authority to issue a cease and desist order, fine, or otherwise penalize managed care plans that violate provisions concerning timely payment for health care services. Provides that a policy issued or delivered to the Department of Healthcare and Family Services that provides coverage to certain persons is subject to the provisions concerning timely payment for health care services. Makes conforming changes in the Illinois Public Aid Code.
Title
INS CD-MANAGED CARE PLAN CLAIM
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-29 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-22 | House | To Medicaid & Managed Care Subcommittee |
2019-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2019-02-26 | House | Assigned to Appropriations-Human Services Committee |
2019-02-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Burke |
2019-02-13 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-13 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-13 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Robyn Gabel |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
215 | 5 | 352 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
215 | 5 | 368a | Amended Code | Citation Text |
305 | 5 | 5-16.8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2465&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB2465.htm |