IL HB2465 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on August 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-25 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0365
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on August 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-25 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0365
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Specialized Mental Health Rehabilitation Act of 2013. Provides that provisional licenses shall be awarded to every entity with a pending application for licensure on the effective date. Provides that the provisional licenses shall be awarded and in effect immediately upon the effective date of the amendatory Act. Provides that for the purpose of compliance with specified Life Safety Code requirements, the Department of Public Health shall accept certain evaluations and waivers. Makes changes to the definition of "executive director". Provides that for comparative purposes, facilities licensed under the Act shall make a specified quarterly report to the Department of specified incidents. Effective July 1, 2017.
Title
SPECIALIZED MH REHAB-LICENSES
Sponsors
Sen. Sara Feigenholtz [D] | Rep. Deborah Conroy [D] | Rep. Camille Lilly [D] | Rep. Natalie Manley [D] |
Rep. Michael McAuliffe [R] | Sen. Heather Steans [D] | Sen. Cristina Castro [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-30 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-28 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-04-28 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-08-25 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0365 |
2017-08-25 | House | Effective Date August 25, 2017 |
2017-08-25 | House | Governor Approved |
2017-06-28 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2017-05-30 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000 |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017 |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 24, 2017 |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Second Reading |
2017-05-12 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 9, 2017 |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-05-04 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Heather A. Steans |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading May 3, 2017 |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2017-04-28 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 093-000-000 |
2017-04-28 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-04-28 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2017-04-28 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Mental Health Committee; 018-000-000 |
2017-04-26 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-04-26 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-04-26 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe |
2017-04-26 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe |
2017-04-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe |
2017-04-26 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Mental Health Committee |
2017-04-25 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-04-25 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Sara Feigenholtz |
2017-04-04 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2017-04-04 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2017-03-30 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-30 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Mental Health Committee; 019-000-000 |
2017-03-23 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2017-02-22 | House | Assigned to Mental Health Committee |
2017-02-08 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-08 | House | First Reading |
2017-02-07 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Sara Feigenholtz |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
210 | 49 | 1-102 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
210 | 49 | 3-213 | New Code | See Bill Text |
210 | 49 | 4-105 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
210 | 49 | 4-108.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |