IL HB2462 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 61-2)
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-04-27 - Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Equal Pay Act of 2003. Prohibits an employer from: (i) screening job applicants based on their wage or salary history, (ii) requiring that an applicant's prior wages satisfy minimum or maximum criteria, and (iii) requesting or requiring as a condition of being interviewed or as a condition of continuing to be considered for an offer of employment that an applicant disclose prior wages or salary. Prohibits an employer from seeking the salary, including benefits or other compensation or salary history, of a job applicant from any current or former employer. Limits defenses. Provides for penalties and injunctive relief.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

EQUAL PAY ACT-WAGE HISTORY

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-26 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 91 N: 24 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-27SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-04-27SenateFirst Reading
2017-04-27SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Daniel Biss
2017-04-27SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2017-04-27SenateArrive in Senate
2017-04-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Sente
2017-04-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Scott Drury
2017-04-26HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 091-024-000
2017-04-25HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-04-25HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2017-04-25HouseRecalled to Second Reading - Short Debate
2017-04-25HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 State Mandates Fiscal Note Filed as Amended
2017-04-25HouseHome Rule Note Filed
2017-04-24HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Fiscal Note Filed as Amended
2017-04-07HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 State Mandates Fiscal Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Tom Demmer
2017-04-07HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Fiscal Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Tom Demmer
2017-04-07HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Economic Opportunity Committee; 007-004-000
2017-04-06HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Economic Opportunity Committee
2017-04-05HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed
2017-04-05HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
2017-04-04HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-04-04HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Anna Moeller
2017-03-30HouseRemoved Co-Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed
2017-03-29HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsay Parkhurst
2017-03-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr.
2017-03-21HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel J. Burke
2017-03-15HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-15HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-15HouseFiscal Note Filed
2017-03-14HouseBalanced Budget Note Filed
2017-03-14HouseState Mandates Fiscal Note Filed
2017-03-13HouseLand Conveyance Appraisal Note Filed
2017-03-13HouseCorrectional Note Filed
2017-03-10HouseJudicial Note Filed
2017-03-10HouseHousing Affordability Impact Note Filed
2017-03-10HousePension Note Filed
2017-03-10HouseState Debt Impact Note Filed
2017-03-09HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-09HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman
2017-03-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley
2017-03-09HouseState Mandates Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Tom Demmer
2017-03-09HouseFiscal Note Requested by Rep. Tom Demmer
2017-03-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Thaddeus Jones
2017-03-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed
2017-03-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
2017-03-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Arthur Turner
2017-03-08HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-07HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Economic Opportunity Committee; 007-004-000
2017-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Burke
2017-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski
2017-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers
2017-03-03HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Cynthia Soto
2017-02-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Al Riley
2017-02-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling
2017-02-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter
2017-02-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth
2017-02-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin
2017-02-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
2017-02-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah
2017-02-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis
2017-02-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares
2017-02-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II
2017-02-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
2017-02-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Brandon W. Phelps
2017-02-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz
2017-02-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. John C. D'Amico
2017-02-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Luis Arroyo
2017-02-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
2017-02-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley
2017-02-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy
2017-02-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Christian L. Mitchell
2017-02-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Rita
2017-02-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams
2017-02-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace
2017-02-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan
2017-02-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Martwick
2017-02-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
2017-02-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2017-02-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2017-02-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis
2017-02-22HouseAssigned to Economic Opportunity Committee
2017-02-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer
2017-02-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2017-02-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper
2017-02-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregory Harris
2017-02-15HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel
2017-02-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood
2017-02-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2017-02-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
2017-02-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
2017-02-08HouseChief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
2017-02-08HouseChief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
2017-02-08HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Juliana Stratton
2017-02-08HouseRemove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Juliana Stratton
2017-02-08HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
2017-02-08HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-08HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-08HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
2017-02-08HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
2017-02-08HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Juliana Stratton
2017-02-08HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lou Lang
2017-02-08HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Brian W. Stewart
2017-02-08HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Elaine Nekritz
2017-02-08HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine
2017-02-08HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman
2017-02-07HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Anna Moeller

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
82011210Amended CodeCitation Text
82011230Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback