IL HB2461 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-3)
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-05-26 - Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the School Code. Requires school report cards to include the most current data collected and maintained (rather than possessed) by the State Board of Education. Requires the State Board to include in the school report cards certain demographic information concerning gifted education and advanced academic programs, as well as information concerning the number of teachers a school has who hold a gifted education endorsement.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SCH CD-SCH REPORT CARDS

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 116 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-26SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017
2017-05-24SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 25, 2017
2017-05-24SenateSecond Reading
2017-05-16SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
2017-05-16SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 17, 2017
2017-05-16SenateDo Pass Education; 010-000-000
2017-05-12SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 19, 2017
2017-05-11SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Dan McConchie
2017-05-05SenateAssigned to Education
2017-05-02SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-05-02SenateFirst Reading
2017-05-02SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush
2017-05-02SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2017-05-02SenateArrive in Senate
2017-04-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed
2017-04-27HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 116-001-000
2017-04-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis
2017-04-26HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Fred Crespo
2017-04-26HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
2017-04-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley
2017-04-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2017-04-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel
2017-04-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Sente
2017-04-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares
2017-04-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Martwick
2017-04-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
2017-04-26HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-04-26HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-15HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
2017-03-15HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-15HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing, Administration & Oversight; 009-000-000
2017-03-15HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing, Administration & Oversight; by Voice Vote
2017-03-14HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine
2017-03-13HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing, Administration & Oversight
2017-03-09HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-09HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Emily McAsey
2017-03-08HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert W. Pritchard
2017-02-22HouseAssigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing, Administration & Oversight
2017-02-08HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-08HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-07HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Emily McAsey

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
105510-17aAmended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback