IL HB2460 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-04-24 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Cynthia Soto
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Code of Criminal Procedure of 1963. Provides that if the defendant is arraigned on or after the effective date of the bill, and the court fails to advise the defendant before the acceptance of a plea of guilty, guilty but mentally ill, or nolo contendere to a misdemeanor or felony offense, that "if you are not a citizen of the United States, you are hereby advised that conviction of the offense for which you have been charged may have the consequences of deportation, exclusion from admission to the United States, or denial of naturalization under the laws of the United States," and the defendant shows that conviction of the offense to which the defendant pleaded guilty, guilty but mentally ill, or nolo contendere may have the consequences for the defendant of deportation, exclusion from admission to the United States, or denial of naturalization under the laws of the United States, the court, upon the defendant's motion, shall vacate the judgment and permit the defendant to withdraw the plea of guilty, guilty but mentally ill, or nolo contendere and enter a plea of not guilty.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CRIM PRO-ALIEN ADVISEMENT

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Cynthia Soto
2017-04-24HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
2017-04-24HouseThird Reading - Consideration Postponed
2017-04-24HousePlaced on Calendar - Consideration Postponed
2017-04-05HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-04-05HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2017-04-05HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-29HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 013-000-000
2017-03-27HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2017-03-24HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-24HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
2017-03-08HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-07HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 008-005-000
2017-02-22HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2017-02-08HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-08HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-07HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
7255113-8Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback