IL HB2459 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-04-28 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Creates the Location-based Video Game Protection Act. Provides that within 4 business days of receiving a request from the real property owner, manager, or custodian, the developer of a location-based video game shall remove from its location-based video game an ecologically sensitive site or location, historically significant site or location, site or location on private property, or site or location otherwise deemed as dangerous by the real property owner, manager, or custodian. Requires the developer of a location-based video game to provide an easily accessible procedure for removal of ecologically sensitive sites or locations, historically significant sites or locations, sites or locations on private property, or sites or locations otherwise deemed as dangerous by the real property owner, manager, or custodian from its location-based video game. Allows for civil enforcement of the Act by a real property owner, manager, or custodian, and a civil fine of up to $100 for each day a developer of a location-based video game is in violation of the Act. Defines terms. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

LOCATION-BASED GAME - REMOVAL

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-28HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-04-26HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2017-04-26HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-04-25HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted - Lost Judiciary - Civil Committee; 004-007-000
2017-04-06HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Civil Committee
2017-04-05HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-04-05HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
2017-04-05HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-04-05HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40
2017-04-05HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Civil Committee; 007-003-000
2017-04-04HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-04-04HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
2017-03-31HouseCommittee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) April 28, 2017
2017-03-29HouseRe-assigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee
2017-02-22HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2017-02-08HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-08HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-07HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback