IL HB2447 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-09-04 - Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. William E. Brady
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Provides that a person commits reckless driving when he or she knowingly drives a vehicle and is involved in an accident when the person has been diagnosed with a medical condition that is likely to cause loss of consciousness or any loss of ability to safely operate a vehicle and the person has failed to comply with a health care professional recommendation or prescribed treatment, or failed to take medication for the condition, and the failure to comply or take medication is the proximate cause of the accident. Effective January 1, 2018.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

VEH CD-SEIZURES WHILE DRIVING

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-15 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-04SenateAlternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. William E. Brady
2017-05-12SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2017-05-09SenatePostponed - Criminal Law
2017-05-03SenatePostponed - Criminal Law
2017-04-25SenateAssigned to Criminal Law
2017-03-16SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-03-16SenateFirst Reading
2017-03-16SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Karen McConnaughay
2017-03-16SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2017-03-16SenateArrive in Senate
2017-03-15HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 109-000-000
2017-03-09HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-09HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-08HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-08HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; 009-000-000
2017-02-22HouseAssigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee
2017-02-08HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-08HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-07HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Robert W. Pritchard

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
625511-503Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback