IL HB2446 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-27 - Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Income Tax Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the sunset of exemptions, credits, and deductions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

REVENUE-TECH

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-27HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood
2018-04-27HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
2018-04-27HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley
2018-04-27HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2017-03-31HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-02-22HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2017-02-08HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-08HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-07HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Robert W. Pritchard

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
355250Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback