IL HB2444 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-03-31 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the School Code with respect to a provision concerning third party non-instructional services. Provides that, notwithstanding any other law of this State, nothing in the Code prevents a board of education from entering into a contract with a third party for non-instructional services currently performed by any employee or bargaining unit member or from laying off those educational support personnel employees upon 30 days written notice to the affected employees (instead of allowing a board of education to enter into a contract with a third party for non-instructional services currently performed by any employee or bargaining unit member or lay off those educational support personnel employees upon 90 days written notice to the affected employees if certain conditions are met). Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SCH CD-NONINSTRUCTIONAL SERVIC

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-31HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-14HouseTo Workforce Reconciliation Subcommittee
2017-02-22HouseAssigned to Labor & Commerce Committee
2017-02-08HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-08HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-07HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Thomas M. Bennett

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
105510-22.34cAmended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback