IL HB2443 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-03-31 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the School Code. Provides that a school district may offer a driver education course in a school by contracting with a commercial driver training school to provide both the classroom instruction part and the practice driving part or either one without having to request a modification or waiver of administrative rules of the State Board of Education. Provides that if a district chooses to contract with a commercial driver training school, then the district must provide evidence to the State Board of Education that the school holds a license issued by the Secretary of State. With respect to the requirement that a driver education course consist of at least 6 clock hours of practice driving in a car having dual operating controls in order for a school district to receive reimbursement from the State, provides that the State Board of Education may allow, in lieu of not more than 5 clock hours of practice driving in a dual control car, such practice driving instruction as it determines is the equivalent of such practice driving in a dual control car. Allows school districts to adopt a policy to permit proficiency examinations for the practice driving part of the driver education course at any time after the completion of 3 hours of practice driving under direct individual instruction. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SCH CD-DRIVER EDUCATION

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-31HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Ryan Spain
2017-02-22HouseAssigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee
2017-02-08HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-08HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-07HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Thomas M. Bennett

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
10552-3.25gAmended CodeCitation Text
105527-24.2Amended CodeCitation Text
105527-24.3Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback