IL HB2442 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-06 - Reported Back To Judiciary - Civil Committee;
Pending: House Judiciary - Civil Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Probate Act of 1975. Provides that the fees incurred by a public guardian for services related to guardianship duties are a first class claim against the estate of a decedent.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

PROBATE-CLAIMS AGAINST ESTATE

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-06HouseReported Back To Judiciary - Civil Committee;
2019-03-06HouseRecommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Judiciary - Civil Committee; 009-000-000
2019-02-27HouseTo Family Law Subcommittee
2019-02-26HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee
2019-02-13HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-02-13HouseFirst Reading
2019-02-13HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Sue Scherer

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
755518-10Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback