IL HB2442 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 30 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-30 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0007
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 30 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-30 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0007
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the School Code. With respect to State assessments in high schools, provides that the assessment administered by the State Board of Education for the purpose of student application to or admissions consideration by institutions of higher education must be administered on a school day during regular student attendance hours. Effective July 1, 2017.
Title
SCH CD-COLLEGE ENTRANCE EXAM
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-19 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 42 N: 8 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-15 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-15 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-30 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0007 |
2017-06-30 | House | Effective Date July 1, 2017 |
2017-06-30 | House | Governor Approved |
2017-06-16 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2017-05-19 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 042-008-000 |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III |
2017-05-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 15, 2017 |
2017-05-12 | Senate | Second Reading |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 4, 2017 |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Do Pass Education; 009-000-000 |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Assigned to Education |
2017-03-17 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-03-17 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Jason A. Barickman |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading March 28, 2017 |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2017-03-15 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 110-000-000 |
2017-03-09 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-09 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie |
2017-03-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2017-03-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Sente |
2017-03-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Swanson |
2017-03-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles Meier |
2017-03-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Randy E. Frese |
2017-03-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2017-03-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2017-03-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Martwick |
2017-03-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2017-03-09 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Fred Crespo |
2017-03-09 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2017-03-09 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2017-03-08 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-08 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; 016-000-000 |
2017-03-07 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert W. Pritchard |
2017-02-22 | House | Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee |
2017-02-08 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-08 | House | First Reading |
2017-02-07 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Thomas M. Bennett |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 5 | 2-3.64a-5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |