IL HB2442 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on May 19 2017 - 75% progression
Action: 2017-06-16 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the School Code. With respect to State assessments in high schools, provides that the assessment administered by the State Board of Education for the purpose of student application to or admissions consideration by institutions of higher education must be administered on a school day during regular student attendance hours. Effective July 1, 2017.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SCH CD-COLLEGE ENTRANCE EXAM

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-19 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 42 N: 8 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-15 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-16HouseSent to the Governor
2017-05-19HousePassed Both Houses
2017-05-19SenateThird Reading - Passed; 042-008-000
2017-05-19SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III
2017-05-12SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 15, 2017
2017-05-12SenateSecond Reading
2017-05-03SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 4, 2017
2017-05-03SenateDo Pass Education; 009-000-000
2017-04-25SenateAssigned to Education
2017-03-17SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-03-17SenateFirst Reading
2017-03-16SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Jason A. Barickman
2017-03-16SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading March 28, 2017
2017-03-16SenateArrive in Senate
2017-03-15HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 110-000-000
2017-03-09HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-09HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie
2017-03-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman
2017-03-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Sente
2017-03-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Swanson
2017-03-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles Meier
2017-03-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Randy E. Frese
2017-03-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
2017-03-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
2017-03-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Martwick
2017-03-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy
2017-03-09HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Fred Crespo
2017-03-09HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2017-03-09HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis
2017-03-08HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-08HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; 016-000-000
2017-03-07HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert W. Pritchard
2017-02-22HouseAssigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee
2017-02-08HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-08HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-07HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Thomas M. Bennett

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
10552-3.64a-5Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback