IL HB2442 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 13 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-13 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0394
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 13 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-13 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0394
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Seed Law. Defines "cool weather grasses". Sets out a labelling requirement for cool weather grasses that includes a "sell by" date. Provides that cool weather grasses may be sold up to 15 months (instead of 12 months) after the applicable test under the Act. Effective immediately.
Title
SEED LAW-COOL WEATHER GRASSES
Sponsors
Rep. Dan Reitz [D] |
Roll Calls
2009-05-19 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-03-24 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-03-24 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-08-13 | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0394 | |
2009-08-13 | Effective Date August 13, 2009 | |
2009-08-13 | Governor Approved | |
2009-06-17 | Sent to the Governor | |
2009-05-19 | Passed Both Houses | |
2009-05-19 | Third Reading - Passed; 058-000-000 | |
2009-05-12 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading ** May 18, 2009 | |
2009-05-12 | Second Reading | |
2009-04-29 | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 30, 2009 | |
2009-04-29 | Do Pass Agriculture and Conservation; 009-000-000 | |
2009-04-15 | Assigned to Agriculture and Conservation | |
2009-03-30 | Referred to Assignments | |
2009-03-30 | First Reading | |
2009-03-26 | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Michael W. Frerichs | |
2009-03-25 | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading March 26, 2009 | |
2009-03-25 | Arrive in Senate | |
2009-03-24 | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 114-000-000 | |
2009-03-24 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-03-23 | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-03-23 | Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-03-04 | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-03-03 | Do Pass / Short Debate Agriculture & Conservation Committee; 012-000-000 | |
2009-02-23 | Assigned to Agriculture & Conservation Committee | |
2009-02-19 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-02-19 | First Reading | |
2009-02-19 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Dan Reitz |