IL HB2437 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Enrolled on May 19 2017 - 75% progression
Action: 2017-05-19 - Passed Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code to allow for the issuance volunteerism special license plate decals by the Illinois Department of Human Services. Provides for the original fee, renewal fees, and fee distribution for the volunteerism decals issued by the Illinois Department of Human Services.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

VEH CD-VOLUNTEERISM PLATES

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-19 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-19HousePassed Both Houses
2017-05-19SenateThird Reading - Passed; 053-000-000
2017-05-12SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 15, 2017
2017-05-12SenateSecond Reading
2017-05-03SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 4, 2017
2017-05-03SenateDo Pass Transportation; 014-000-000
2017-04-25SenateAssigned to Transportation
2017-04-04SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-04-04SenateFirst Reading
2017-04-03SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Karen McConnaughay
2017-03-29SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading March 30, 2017
2017-03-29SenateArrive in Senate
2017-03-29HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock
2017-03-29HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 114-000-000
2017-03-23HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-23HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-15HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr.
2017-03-15HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-15HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; 009-000-000
2017-02-22HouseAssigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee
2017-02-08HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-08HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-06HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Steven A. Andersson

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
62553-699.14Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback