IL HB2434 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 7 2025 - 100% progression
Action: 2025-01-07 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 7 2025 - 100% progression
Action: 2025-01-07 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Act on the Aging, the Children and Family Services Act, the Department of Human Services Act, and the Department of Public Health Powers and Duties Law. Requires the Department on Aging, and the Departments of Children and Family Services, Human Services, and Public Health to provide technical assistance in the form of training to local governmental entities and not-for-profit human service entities located within Illinois that request such assistance for the purpose of procuring grants. Requires the Departments to prioritize entities that: (i) are current grant recipients and are routinely noncompliant with grant award requirements; and (ii) have lost Department grant funding in the last 5 years and are seeking to reapply for grant funding. Requires the Departments to adopt rules. Effective July 1, 2023.
Title
AGING-DHS-GRANT ASSISTANCE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2025-01-07 | House | Session Sine Die |
2024-05-31 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2024-05-26 | House | Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Extended-Rule May 31, 2024 |
2024-05-24 | House | Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Extended-Rule May 27, 2024 |
2024-04-05 | House | Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Extended-Rule May 24, 2024 |
2024-02-28 | House | Assigned to Appropriations-Health & Human Services Committee |
2023-05-19 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2023-03-10 | House | Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Extended-Rule May 19, 2023 |
2023-02-28 | House | Assigned to Appropriations-Health & Human Services Committee |
2023-02-15 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-02-15 | House | First Reading |
2023-02-14 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 105 | 4.17 | New Code | See Bill Text |
20 | 1305 | 10-75 | New Code | See Bill Text |
20 | 2310 | 2310-720 | New Code | See Bill Text |
20 | 505 | 34.13 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2434&GAID=17&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=112&GA=103 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/103/HB/10300HB2434.htm |