IL HB2434 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-03-31 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Criminal Code of 2012. Provides that the penalty for theft in which the offense is committed against a not-for-profit organization that is exempt from taxation under Section 501(c)(3) of the Internal Revenue Code of 1986 is one class higher than the penalty for theft committed against other persons. Provides that if the penalty for theft otherwise provided for is a Class X felony, the penalty under this provision is the penalty for a Class X felony with a minimum term of imprisonment of 7 years. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CRIM CD-THEFT-501(c)(3) ORG

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-31HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-15HouseTo Sentencing, Penalties and Criminal Procedure Subcommittee
2017-02-22HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2017-02-08HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-08HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-06HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Keith R. Wheeler

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
720516-1Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback