IL HB2433 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 16 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-06-14 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Hospital Licensing Act and the University of Illinois Hospital Act. Requires every hospital to ensure that it has the proper instruments available for taking a pregnant woman's blood pressure. Provides that the Department of Public Health shall adopt rules for the implementation of the requirement.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

HOSPITAL-BLOOD PRESSURE

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-16 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 111 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-14HouseSent to the Governor
2019-05-16HousePassed Both Houses
2019-05-16SenateThird Reading - Passed; 056-000-000
2019-05-14SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 15, 2019
2019-05-14SenateSecond Reading
2019-05-08SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 9, 2019
2019-05-08SenateDo Pass Public Health; 008-000-000
2019-05-07SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz
2019-05-06SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2019-05-06SenateAlternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Christopher Belt
2019-04-24SenateAssigned to Public Health
2019-03-27SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-03-27SenateFirst Reading
2019-03-27SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2019-03-27SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2019-03-27SenateArrive in Senate
2019-03-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper
2019-03-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray
2019-03-27HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 111-002-000
2019-03-19HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2019-03-19HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2019-03-15HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin
2019-03-14HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
2019-03-07HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2019-03-06HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 016-000-000
2019-02-26HouseAssigned to Human Services Committee
2019-02-13HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-02-13HouseFirst Reading
2019-02-13HouseChief Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood
2019-02-13HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Mary E. Flowers

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1103308bNew CodeSee Bill Text
2108511.1aNew CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback