IL HB2433 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on December 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-03 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on December 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-03 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Use Tax Act, the Service Use Tax Act, the Service Occupation Tax Act, and the Retailers' Occupation Tax Act. Provides that motor fuel and gasohol are exempt from taxation under the Acts. Amends the Motor Fuel Tax Law. Provides that, beginning July 1, 2011, the tax is imposed at the rate of $0.38 per gallon. Provides that, of the additional taxes imposed under the Motor Fuel Tax Law, (i) 15 cents per gallon shall be deposited into the General Revenue Fund and (ii) 0.8 cents per gallon shall be deposited into the County and Mass Transit District Fund and (iii) 3.2 cents per gallon shall be deposited into the Local Government Tax Fund. Effective immediately.
Title
FUEL-INCREASE MFT-NO USE/OCC
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-03 | House | Session Sine Die |
2013-03-22 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2013-02-25 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2013-02-20 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-02-20 | House | First Reading |
2013-02-20 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. David Harris |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
35 | 105 | 3-5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 110 | 3-5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 115 | 3-5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 120 | 2-5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 505 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 505 | 8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2433&GAID=12&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=85&GA=98 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/98/HB/09800HB2433.htm |