IL HB2432 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Enrolled on May 29 2021 - 75% progression
Action: 2021-06-25 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Changes certain deadlines for the Secretary of State to implement provisions regarding electronic records from July 1, 2021 to July 1, 2022. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

VEH CD-ELECTRONIC RECORDS

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-29 - Senate - Motion in Senate (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-25HouseSent to the Governor
2021-05-29HousePassed Both Houses
2021-05-29SenateThird Reading - Passed; 059-000-000
2021-05-27SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading ** May 28, 2021
2021-05-20SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 21, 2021
2021-05-20SenateSecond Reading
2021-05-19SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 20, 2021
2021-05-19SenateDo Pass Transportation; 019-000-000
2021-05-11SenateAssigned to Transportation
2021-04-23SenateReferred to Assignments
2021-04-23SenateFirst Reading
2021-04-23SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Ram Villivalam
2021-04-23SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2021-04-23SenateArrive in Senate
2021-04-22HouseThird Reading - Consent Calendar - Passed 113-000-000
2021-04-21HouseThird Reading - Consent Calendar - First Day
2021-04-16HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Consent Calendar
2021-04-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Seth Lewis
2021-04-15HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Consent Calendar
2021-04-15HouseSecond Reading - Consent Calendar
2021-03-18HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Consent Calendar
2021-03-17HouseDo Pass / Consent Calendar Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; 010-000-000
2021-03-09HouseAssigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee
2021-02-19HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2021-02-19HouseFirst Reading
2021-02-17HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. John C. D'Amico

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
62553-100.1Amended CodeCitation Text
62553-100.2Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback