IL HB2432 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Administration of Psychotropic Medications to Children Act. Provides that the Department of Children and Family Services shall adopt rules requiring the Department to distribute treatment guidelines on an annual basis to all persons licensed under the Medical Practice Act of 1987 to practice medicine in all of its branches who prescribe psychotropic medications to youth for whom the Department is legally responsible. Provides that the Department shall prepare and submit an annual report to the General Assembly with specified information concerning the administration of psychotropic medication to youth for whom it is legally responsible. Amends the Medical Practice Act of 1987. Provides that the Department of Financial and Professional Regulation may revoke, suspend, place on probation, reprimand, refuse to issue or renew, or take any other disciplinary or non-disciplinary action as the Department may deem proper with regard to the license or permit of any person issued under the Act upon repeated acts of clearly excessive prescribing, furnishing, or administering psychotropic medications to a minor without a good faith prior examination of the patient and medical reason. Makes other changes.
Title
FOSTER CHILD-PSYCH DRUGS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-02-18 | House | Assigned to Adoption & Child Welfare Committee |
2019-03-29 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-20 | House | To Special Issues (ACSI) |
2019-02-26 | House | Assigned to Adoption & Child Welfare Committee |
2019-02-13 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-13 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-13 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2019-02-13 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 535 | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 535 | 7 | New Code | See Bill Text |
225 | 60 | 22 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2432&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB2432.htm |