IL HB2431 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 22 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-11-29 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 22 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-11-29 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Emergency Medical Services (EMS) Systems Act. Provides that the Department of Public Health shall have the authority and responsibility to adopt rules permitting immediate reciprocity to all emergency medical services personnel who have received a certification issued by the National Registry of Emergency Medical Technicians, allowing such individuals to operate in a provisional status until the Illinois license is issued. Provides that to operate as EMS personnel on provisional status, an individual must have applied for licensure with the Department and meet all requirements for licensure. Provides that, until October 1, 2022, the Department must require each EMS System Program Plan to permit the utilization of alternative staffing models. Provides that each EMS System Program Plan shall be required to implement alternative staffing models no later than January 1, 2022. Exempts local governments and local government employees who provide EMS services from being required to implement alternative staffing models. Amends the Illinois Administrative Procedure Act to authorize emergency rulemaking. Effective immediately.
Title
MASSAGE THERAPY-SUNSET
Sponsors
Rep. William Davis [D] | Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin [D] | Rep. Deborah Conroy [D] | Rep. Ann Williams [D] |
Sen. David Koehler [D] | Sen. Sara Feigenholtz [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-10-27 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-11-29 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2021-11-29 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Rule 19(b) / Motion Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-11-29 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(b) / Motion Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-10-28 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Health Care Licenses Committee |
2021-10-28 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Health Care Licenses Committee |
2021-10-27 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams |
2021-10-27 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2021-10-27 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin |
2021-10-27 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-10-27 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion Filed Concur Rep. William Davis |
2021-10-27 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-10-27 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. William Davis |
2021-10-27 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. William Davis |
2021-10-27 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Sara Feigenholtz |
2021-10-27 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1, 2 |
2021-10-27 | House | Arrived in House |
2021-10-27 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 054-000-000 |
2021-10-27 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2021-10-27 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Koehler |
2021-10-27 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2021-10-26 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Health; 013-000-000 |
2021-10-26 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Health |
2021-10-25 | Senate | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. David Koehler |
2021-10-25 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2021-10-25 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. David Koehler |
2021-10-13 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b)(ii) this bill shall not be re-referred to the Committee on Assignment pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b). |
2021-08-26 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading August 31, 2021 |
2021-08-26 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2021-08-25 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As December 1, 2021 |
2021-06-15 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2021-06-15 | Senate | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Michael E. Hastings |
2021-05-31 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As June 15, 2021 |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 28, 2021 |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Second Reading |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Executive; 009-005-000 |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Executive |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 29, 2021 |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-04-23 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2021-04-22 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 114-000-000 |
2021-04-22 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2021-04-22 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2021-04-22 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2021-04-22 | House | Removed from Consent Calendar Status Rep. Theresa Mah |
2021-04-21 | House | Third Reading - Consent Calendar - First Day |
2021-04-21 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 005-000-000 |
2021-04-20 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-04-20 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Theresa Mah |
2021-04-16 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-04-15 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-04-15 | House | Second Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-03-18 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-03-17 | House | Do Pass / Consent Calendar Health Care Licenses Committee; 008-000-000 |
2021-03-09 | House | Assigned to Health Care Licenses Committee |
2021-02-19 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-02-19 | House | First Reading |
2021-02-17 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Theresa Mah |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
225 | 57 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 57 | 10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 57 | 12 | New Code | See Bill Text |
225 | 57 | 15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 57 | 25 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 57 | 32 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 57 | 45 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 57 | 50 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 57 | 60 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 57 | 95 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 80 | 4.32 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 80 | 4.41 | New Code | See Bill Text |
805 | 10 | 3.6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |