IL HB2430 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-24 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregory Harris
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Repeals the Rent Control Preemption Act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

RENT CONTROL PREEMPTION ACT

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregory Harris
2018-04-13HouseRemoved Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2018-04-13HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2018-03-29HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
2017-08-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah
2017-03-31HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-29HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares
2017-03-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2017-03-08HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood
2017-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Luis Arroyo
2017-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2017-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
2017-02-24HouseTo Real & Personal Property Law Subcommittee
2017-02-22HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee
2017-02-08HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-08HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-06HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Will Guzzardi

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
50825ActRepealed CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback