IL HB2428 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Property Tax Code. Provides that the provisions of a section relating to erroneous homestead exemptions applies to all counties (currently, only counties with 3,000,000 or more inhabitants).
Title
PROP TX-HOMESTEAD EXEMPTION
Sponsors
Rep. Ryan Spain [R] | Rep. Jonathan Carroll [D] | Rep. Justin Slaughter [D] | Rep. Michael Unes [R] |
Rep. Martin Moylan [D] | Rep. Rita Mayfield [D] | Rep. Emanuel Welch [D] | Rep. LaShawn Ford [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2018-05-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2018-05-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2018-05-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2018-05-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
2018-05-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael D. Unes |
2018-05-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter |
2018-05-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2017-04-28 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-04-28 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2017-04-27 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-04-27 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Ryan Spain |
2017-04-26 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-04-26 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-04-07 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-04-07 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Ryan Spain |
2017-03-16 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-16 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Revenue & Finance Committee; 011-000-000 |
2017-03-16 | House | Remains in Revenue & Finance Committee |
2017-03-16 | House | Recommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Revenue & Finance Committee; 006-000-000 |
2017-03-09 | House | To Property Tax Subcommittee |
2017-02-22 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2017-02-08 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-08 | House | First Reading |
2017-02-06 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Ryan Spain |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
35 | 200 | 9-275 | Amended Code | Citation Text |