IL HB2427 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on August 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-11 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0056
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on August 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-11 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0056
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Township Code. Provides that a township may, by ordinance, provide for the collection, transport, disposal, and recycling of brush, wood chips, and leaves (currently, only collection, transport, and disposal of brush and leaves) within the unincorporated areas of the township without referendum approval. Defines "recycling". Effective immediately.
Title
TWP CD-RECYCLING YARD WASTE
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-19 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-08-11 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0056 |
2017-08-11 | House | Effective Date August 11, 2017 |
2017-08-11 | House | Governor Approved |
2017-06-16 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2017-05-19 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 052-000-000 |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III |
2017-05-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 15, 2017 |
2017-05-12 | Senate | Second Reading |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 4, 2017 |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Do Pass Local Government; 009-000-000 |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Assigned to Local Government |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-04-06 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Chris Nybo |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2017-04-05 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 114-000-000 |
2017-04-04 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-04-04 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-30 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-30 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Counties & Townships Committee; 007-000-000 |
2017-03-30 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Counties & Townships Committee; by Voice Vote |
2017-03-08 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Counties & Townships Committee |
2017-03-06 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-06 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. David S. Olsen |
2017-02-22 | House | Assigned to Counties & Townships Committee |
2017-02-08 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-08 | House | First Reading |
2017-02-06 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. David S. Olsen |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
60 | 1 | 210-10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
60 | 1 | 210-7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |