IL HB2426 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Enrolled on May 19 2017 - 75% progression
Action: 2017-06-16 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the School Code. In provisions concerning the Early Childhood Education Block Grant, provides that (i) the requirement to fund programs for children ages 0-3 applies to funds distributed by this State and funds distributed to the Chicago school district, and the State Board of Education shall report annually, on or before December 1, on how much funding was allocated to programs for children ages 0-3 both by the State Board of Education and by the Chicago school district; and (ii) the requirement that the percentage of Early Childhood Education Block Grant funding allocated to programs for children ages 0-3 each fiscal year remain at least 20% of the overall Early Childhood Education Block Grant allocation, once that percentage has been reached, applies to funds distributed by this State and funds distributed to the Chicago school district. In provisions concerning grants for preschool educational programs and programs concerning services to at-risk children and their families, provides that the Chicago school district is also subject to the requirement to supplement, not supplant, funds received from other sources.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SCH CD-PRESCHOOL GRANTS-CHI

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-19 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 38 N: 13 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 111 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-16HouseSent to the Governor
2017-05-19HousePassed Both Houses
2017-05-19SenateThird Reading - Passed; 038-013-000
2017-05-19SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2017-05-12SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 15, 2017
2017-05-12SenateSecond Reading
2017-05-03SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 4, 2017
2017-05-03SenateDo Pass Education; 011-001-000
2017-05-01SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Karen McConnaughay
2017-04-27SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
2017-04-25SenateAssigned to Education
2017-04-06SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-04-06SenateFirst Reading
2017-04-05SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino
2017-04-05SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading April 6, 2017
2017-04-05SenateArrive in Senate
2017-04-05HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
2017-04-05HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
2017-04-05HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Cynthia Soto
2017-04-05HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 111-003-000
2017-04-04HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
2017-04-04HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-04-04HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-29HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-28HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Appropriations-Elementary & Secondary Education Committee; 020-000-000
2017-03-28HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Appropriations-Elementary & Secondary Education Committee; by Voice Vote
2017-03-27HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Appropriations-Elementary & Secondary Education Committee
2017-03-24HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-24HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
2017-02-22HouseAssigned to Appropriations-Elementary & Secondary Education Committee
2017-02-08HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-08HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-06HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
10551C-2Amended CodeCitation Text
10552-3.71Amended CodeCitation Text
10552-3.89Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback