IL HB2424 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-3)
Status: Introduced on February 17 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-05 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Seth Lewis
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 17 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-05 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Seth Lewis
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Department of Commerce and Economic Opportunity Law of the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois. Provides that of the federal funds received by the State for purposes related to the COVID-19 public health emergency, 25% of any such funds received on or after March 1, 2021 shall be allocated for use by the Coronavirus Business Interruption Grant Program (BIG Program). Effective immediately.
Title
DCEO-COVID RELIEF PROGRAM
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Seth Lewis |
2021-04-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie |
2021-04-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez |
2021-04-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams |
2021-04-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anthony DeLuca |
2021-03-27 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2021-03-27 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2021-03-23 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Appropriations-General Services Committee |
2021-03-19 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-03-19 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Margaret Croke |
2021-03-11 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2021-03-09 | House | Assigned to Appropriations-General Services Committee |
2021-03-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II |
2021-02-19 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith R. Wheeler |
2021-02-17 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-02-17 | House | First Reading |
2021-02-17 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Margaret Croke |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 605 | 605-1050 | Amended Code | Citation Text |