IL HB2415 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on April 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-02 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0002
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on April 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-02 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0002
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Counties Code. Provides that if an ordinance or resolution imposing a tax under the County Cannabis Retailers' Occupation Tax Law was adopted on or before October 1, 2020 and a certified copy thereof was filed with the Department of Revenue on or before November 1, 2020, then the Department shall proceed to administer and enforce this Section as of May 1, 2021 for such ordinances or resolutions. Effective immediately.
Title
COUNTY CANNABIS REVENUE-ADMIN
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-25 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 100 N: 10 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 100 N: 10 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-02 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0002 |
2021-04-02 | House | Effective Date April 2, 2021 |
2021-04-02 | House | Governor Approved |
2021-04-02 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2021-03-25 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 054-000-000 |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 25, 2021 |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Second Reading |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 24, 2021 |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Do Pass Executive; 014-000-000 |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Waive Posting Notice |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Karina Villa |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Cristina Castro |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-03-19 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Karina Villa |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading March 19, 2021 |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2021-03-18 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 100-010-000 |
2021-03-18 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2021-03-18 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2021-03-17 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2021-03-17 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2021-03-17 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2021-03-17 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 015-000-000 |
2021-03-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maura Hirschauer |
2021-03-09 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Suzanne Ness |
2021-03-09 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez |
2021-03-09 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2021-02-17 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-02-17 | House | First Reading |
2021-02-17 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Anna Moeller |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
55 | 5 | 5-1006.8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |