IL HB2414 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Introduced on February 17 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-27 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 17 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-27 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Election Code. Allows the State Board of Elections to receive voter registration information provided by applicants using electronic voter registration portals (rather than the Board's website). Provides that notwithstanding any other provision of law, a person who is otherwise qualified to vote may preregister to vote on or after that person's 16th birthday, with the registration held in abeyance by the appropriate election authority until that individual attains the required age to vote. Requires preregistration to be completed using the online voter registration system or an electronic voter registration portal. Provides that for the purposes of the Code, an individual who is 16 years of age or older (rather than who is 17 years of age and who will be 18 years of age on the date of the general or consolidated election) shall be deemed competent to execute and attest to any voter registration forms.
Title
ELEC CD-PRE-REGISTRATION
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-27 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2021-03-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis |
2021-03-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsey LaPointe |
2021-03-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2021-03-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Edgar Gonzalez, Jr. |
2021-03-09 | House | Assigned to Ethics & Elections Committee |
2021-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2021-03-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Bob Morgan |
2021-02-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2021-02-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2021-02-19 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason |
2021-02-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Delia C. Ramirez |
2021-02-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling |
2021-02-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Didech |
2021-02-19 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2021-02-19 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2021-02-17 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-02-17 | House | First Reading |
2021-02-17 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Deb Conroy |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
10 | 5 | 1A-16.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
10 | 5 | 3-6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2414&GAID=16&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/HB/10200HB2414.htm |