IL HB2413 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-20 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0428
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-20 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0428
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Local Mass Transit District Act. Provides that, on January 1, 2022, the Chicago South Suburban Mass Transit District is discontinued. Includes procedures for discontinuance, including transfer of: all funds remaining after winding up the District to specified municipalities that created the District; and parking lots and related facilities and equipment to the municipality in which the parking lot is located. Effective January 1, 2022.
Title
CHI S. SUBURBAN MASS TRANSIT
Sponsors
Rep. William Davis [D] | Rep. Mark Batinick [R] | Rep. Anthony DeLuca [D] | Rep. Blaine Wilhour [R] |
Sen. Andrew Chesney [R] | Rep. Dan Ugaste [R] | Sen. Napoleon Harris [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-05-29 - Senate - Motion in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-08-20 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0428 |
2021-08-20 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2022 |
2021-08-20 | House | Governor Approved |
2021-06-25 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2021-05-29 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2021-05-29 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 058-000-000 |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading ** May 28, 2021 |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 21, 2021 |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Second Reading |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 20, 2021 |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Do Pass Executive; 014-000-000 |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Reported Back To Executive; 002-000-001 |
2021-05-13 | Senate | To Executive- Consolidation |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-04-22 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 22, 2021 |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2021-04-21 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Anthony DeLuca |
2021-04-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Ugaste |
2021-04-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Andrew S. Chesney |
2021-04-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Blaine Wilhour |
2021-04-21 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 116-000-000 |
2021-04-21 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick |
2021-04-20 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2021-04-20 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2021-03-18 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2021-03-15 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee; 013-000-000 |
2021-03-09 | House | Assigned to Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee |
2021-02-17 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-02-17 | House | First Reading |
2021-02-17 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. William Davis |