IL HB2412 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends "An Act concerning land", Public Act 95-982. Provides that the conveyance of certain real property shall be made subject to the condition that title to the buildings and the land shall revert to the State of Illinois, Department of Corrections, if Peoria County ceases to use the buildings and the land for a public or private purpose (instead of "a public purpose"). Effective immediately.
Title
HANNA WORK CAMP-USE OF LAND
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2017-03-31 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-17 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth |
2017-02-14 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2017-02-06 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-06 | House | First Reading |
2017-02-06 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael D. Unes |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2412&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB2412.htm |