IL HB2409 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 21 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-10-25 - Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 21 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-10-25 - Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Economic Development for a Growing Economy Tax Credit Act. Provides that the Department of Commerce and Economic Opportunity shall not issue a tax certificate to any taxpayer under this Act unless the taxpayer first submits a supplier diversity report. Provides that the Department of Commerce and Economic Opportunity shall publish on its website all supplier diversity reports filed by taxpayers under this Act and maintain those reports for at least 5 years.
Title
EDGE TAX CREDIT-DIVERSITY
Sponsors
Rep. William Davis [D] | Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin [D] | Rep. Amy Grant [R] | Sen. Cristina Castro [D] |
Sen. Kimberly Lightford [D] | Sen. Celina Villanueva [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-21 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-25 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2021-10-25 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Celina Villanueva |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-04-22 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 22, 2021 |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2021-04-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Amy Grant |
2021-04-21 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin |
2021-04-21 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 116-000-000 |
2021-04-16 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2021-04-16 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2021-04-08 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2021-03-25 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin |
2021-03-25 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Revenue & Finance Committee; 018-000-000 |
2021-03-25 | House | Reported Back To Revenue & Finance Committee; |
2021-03-25 | House | Recommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Revenue & Finance Committee; 006-000-000 |
2021-03-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin |
2021-03-18 | House | To Income Tax Subcommittee |
2021-03-09 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2021-02-17 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-02-17 | House | First Reading |
2021-02-17 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. William Davis |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
35 | 10 | 5-57 | Amended Code | Citation Text |