IL HB2407 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Enrolled on May 19 2017 - 75% progression
Action: 2017-05-19 - Passed Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Municipal Code. Provides that, for the purposes of annexation of contiguous territory, territory shall be considered contiguous to a municipality notwithstanding that the territory is separated from the municipality by a lake, river, or other waterway.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

TWP SIZE-MUNI ANNEXATION

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-19 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-16 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 106 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-19HousePassed Both Houses
2017-05-19SenateThird Reading - Passed; 051-000-000
2017-05-12SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 15, 2017
2017-05-12SenateSecond Reading
2017-05-10SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 11, 2017
2017-05-10SenateDo Pass Local Government; 008-000-000
2017-05-03SenatePostponed - Local Government
2017-04-25SenateAssigned to Local Government
2017-03-28SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-03-28SenateFirst Reading
2017-03-23SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes
2017-03-17SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading March 28, 2017
2017-03-17SenateArrive in Senate
2017-03-16HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 106-001-001
2017-03-15HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-15HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2017-03-15HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Fortner
2017-03-15HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Cities & Villages Committee; 014-000-000
2017-03-09HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Cities & Villages Committee
2017-03-08HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-08HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Mike Fortner
2017-03-07HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-07HouseRecalled to Second Reading - Short Debate
2017-02-24HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-02-24HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-02-23HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-02-22HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Cities & Villages Committee; 011-000-000
2017-02-14HouseAssigned to Cities & Villages Committee
2017-02-06HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-06HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-06HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
6557-1-1Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback