IL HB2405 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-16 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0396
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-16 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0396
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Insurance Code. Authorizes the Illinois Insurance Guaranty Fund, at the direction of its board of directors and subject to the approval of the Director of Insurance, to form and own a not-for-profit corporation to which the Fund may delegate certain of its powers and duties provided by the Code. Allows the not-for-profit corporation to contract to provide services to the Office of Special Deputy Receiver or any other person or organization authorized by law to carry out the duties of the Director in the capacity of receiver under specified provisions of the Code, the Illinois Life and Health Insurance Guaranty Association, an organizations in another state similar to the Illinois Insurance Guaranty Fund or the Illinois Life and Health Insurance Guaranty Association. Effective immediately.
Title
INSURANCE GUARANTY FUND
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-27 - Senate - Motion in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-08-16 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0396 |
2021-08-16 | House | Effective Date August 16, 2021 |
2021-08-16 | House | Governor Approved |
2021-06-23 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2021-05-27 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000 |
2021-05-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading ** May 25, 2021 |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 10, 2021 |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Second Reading |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 5, 2021 |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-04-27 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 22, 2021 |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2021-04-21 | House | Third Reading - Consent Calendar - Passed 117-000-000 |
2021-04-16 | House | Third Reading - Consent Calendar - First Day |
2021-04-14 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-04-14 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-04-14 | House | Second Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-04-08 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-03-25 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Consent Calendar Insurance Committee; 018-000-000 |
2021-03-25 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Insurance Committee; by Voice Vote |
2021-03-23 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Insurance Committee |
2021-03-22 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-03-22 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jay Hoffman |
2021-03-09 | House | Assigned to Insurance Committee |
2021-02-17 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-02-17 | House | First Reading |
2021-02-17 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jay Hoffman |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
215 | 5 | 532 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
215 | 5 | 537.9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
215 | 5 | 538 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
215 | 5 | 538.10 | New Code | See Bill Text |
215 | 5 | 538.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
215 | 5 | 538.7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |