IL HB2401 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Common Interest Community Association Act. Provides that the association shall have one class of voting membership (instead of "one class of membership") unless the declaration, bylaws, or operating agreement provide otherwise. Makes a similar change in the Condominium Property Act. Further amends the Condominium Property Act. Deletes language providing that if the property contains 4 or more units, the owners may agree to sell the property by a vote of 75%. Provides instead that if the property contains at least 4 but not more than 6 units, a vote of 75% of the owners is required to sell the condominium property. Provides that if the property contains 7 or more units, a vote of 85% of the owners is required to sell the condominium property.
Title
CONDO/CICAA-SALES; MEMBERSHIP
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-29 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-09 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 103 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-09 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 103 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2018-07-02 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2018-07-02 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Rule 19(b) / Motion Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-07-02 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Rule 19(b) / Motion Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-01-24 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2018-01-24 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2018-01-24 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 2, 3 |
2018-01-24 | House | Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 005-000-000 |
2017-09-28 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-09-28 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Rule 19(b) / Motion Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-09-28 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Rule 19(b) / Motion Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-09-13 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Sara Feigenholtz |
2017-05-30 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2017-05-30 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2017-05-29 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-05-29 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-05-29 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Elaine Nekritz |
2017-05-29 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Elaine Nekritz |
2017-05-29 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 2, 3 |
2017-05-29 | House | Arrived in House |
2017-05-29 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a) |
2017-05-29 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 049-000-001 |
2017-05-29 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2017-05-29 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted; Mulroe |
2017-05-29 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Mulroe |
2017-05-29 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017 |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommend Do Adopt Judiciary; 010-000-001 |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Assignments Refers to Judiciary |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. John G. Mulroe |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Judiciary; 008-000-001 |
2017-05-15 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Judiciary |
2017-05-15 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 16, 2017 |
2017-05-15 | Senate | Second Reading |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. John G. Mulroe |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 10, 2017 |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Do Pass Judiciary; 009-000-001 |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. John G. Mulroe |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. John G. Mulroe |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Postponed - Judiciary |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. John G. Mulroe |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-03-16 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading March 14, 2017 |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2017-03-09 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 103-002-000 |
2017-03-07 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-07 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-02-23 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-02-23 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Civil Committee; 006-000-000 |
2017-02-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2017-02-14 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2017-02-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Martwick |
2017-02-06 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-06 | House | First Reading |
2017-02-03 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Elaine Nekritz |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
765 | 160 | 1-30 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
765 | 605 | 15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
765 | 605 | 18 | Amended Code | Citation Text |