IL HB2400 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Common Interest Community Association Act. Provides that all voting by the members of a common interest community association shall be on a non-cumulative basis. Amends the Condominium Property Act. Provides that the bylaws shall provide that voting shall be on a non-cumulative basis.
Title
CONDO/CICAA-NONCUMULATIVE VOTE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2017-03-31 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-24 | House | To Civil Procedure Subcommittee |
2017-02-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2017-02-14 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2017-02-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Martwick |
2017-02-06 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-06 | House | First Reading |
2017-02-03 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Elaine Nekritz |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
765 | 160 | 1-25 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
765 | 605 | 18 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2400&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB2400.htm |