IL HB2395 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Marriage and Dissolution of Marriage Act. Provides that notwithstanding any other provision of law, federal veterans' disability benefits received by a party shall not be considered to be income of that party for purposes of any maintenance determination under this Section. Provides that the court may not require that a party use federal veterans' disability benefits to pay maintenance.
Title
IMDMA - VETERAN BENEFITS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2017-03-31 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-24 | House | To Domestic Relations Law Subcommittee |
2017-02-14 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2017-02-06 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-06 | House | First Reading |
2017-02-03 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Robert W. Pritchard |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
750 | 5 | 504 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2395&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB2395.htm |