IL HB2393 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-04-28 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Business Enterprise for Minorities, Females, and Persons with Disabilities Act. Provides that all State agencies shall increase their award of State contracts to minority owned businesses by 15%.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

ST CONTRACTS-MINORITY BUSINESS

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-28HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-04-26HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Standard Debate
2017-04-26HouseSecond Reading - Standard Debate
2017-04-06HouseState Mandates Fiscal Note Filed
2017-04-05HouseFiscal Note Filed
2017-04-03HouseState Mandates Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Tom Demmer
2017-04-03HouseFiscal Note Requested by Rep. Tom Demmer
2017-03-30HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Standard Debate
2017-03-29HouseDo Pass / Standard Debate State Government Administration Committee; 004-003-000
2017-02-14HouseAssigned to State Government Administration Committee
2017-02-06HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-06HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-03HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Mary E. Flowers

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
305754Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback