IL HB2391 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 17 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-11-29 - Rule 19(b) / Motion Referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 17 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-11-29 - Rule 19(b) / Motion Referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Property Tax Code. In a Section concerning the homestead exemption for veterans with disabilities, provides that: (1) for taxable years prior to 2015, "surviving spouse" means the surviving spouse of a veteran who obtained the exemption prior to his or her death; (2) for taxable years 2015 through 2020, "surviving spouse" means (A) the surviving spouse of a veteran who obtained the exemption prior to his or her death and (B) the surviving spouse of a veteran who was killed in the line of duty in the current taxable year or any preceding taxable year; and (3) for taxable year 2021 and thereafter, "surviving spouse" means (A) the surviving spouse of a veteran who qualified for the exemption prior to his or her death, (B) the surviving spouse of a veteran who was killed in the line of duty in the current taxable year or any preceding taxable year, (C) the surviving spouse of a veteran who did not obtain the exemption before death, but who would have qualified for the exemption if he or she had survived, and (D) the surviving spouse of a veteran whose death was determined to be service-connected who is a current recipient of Dependency and Indemnity Compensation. Effective immediately.
Title
PROP TX-SURVIVING SPOUSE
Sponsors
Rep. Stephanie Kifowit [D] | Rep. Mark Batinick [R] | Rep. Joe Sosnowski [R] | Rep. Mark Walker [D] |
Rep. Jonathan Carroll [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-11-29 | House | Rule 19(b) / Motion Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-03-31 | House | Motion Filed - Table Bill/Resolution Pursuant to Rule 60(b), Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2021-03-27 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2021-03-18 | House | To Property Tax Subcommittee |
2021-03-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2021-03-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark L. Walker |
2021-03-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joe Sosnowski |
2021-03-09 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2021-02-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick |
2021-02-17 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-02-17 | House | First Reading |
2021-02-17 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
35 | 200 | 15-169 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2391&GAID=16&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/HB/10200HB2391.htm |