IL HB2389 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-03-31 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Higher Education Student Assistance Act. Provides that for each of the following periods of hostilities, each county shall be entitled, annually, to one honorary scholarship in a public institution of higher learning for the benefit of the children of persons who served in the armed forces of the United States, except that the total number of scholarships annually granted to recipients from each county may not exceed 3: (1) any time between September 16, 1940 and the termination of World War II; (2) any time during the national emergency between June 25, 1950 and January 31, 1955; (3) any time during the Viet Nam conflict between January 1, 1961 and May 7, 1975; (4) any time during the siege of Beirut and the Grenada Conflict between June 14, 1982 and December 15, 1983; (5) any time on or after August 2, 1990 and until Congress or the President orders that persons in service are no longer eligible for the Southwest Asia Service Medal; or (6) any time during Operation Enduring Freedom and Operation Iraqi Freedom. Sets forth scholarship qualifications and preferences. Provides that recipients are entitled to receive instruction in any or all departments of a public institution of higher learning without charge for tuition for a term of at least 4 consecutive years. Requires the Illinois Student Assistance Commission to administer the scholarship program. Makes changes to a provision of the University of Illinois Act providing for a similar scholarship. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

HIGHER ED ASSIST-CHILD OF VET

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-31HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-02-23HouseTo Higher Education Analysis Subcommittee
2017-02-14HouseAssigned to Higher Education Committee
2017-02-09HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. David S. Olsen
2017-02-06HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-06HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-03HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Brad Halbrook

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1103059Amended CodeCitation Text
11094742New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback