IL HB2389 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 19 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-03-13 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 19 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-03-13 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Criminal Code of 1961. Provides that a federally licensed firearms dealer may not transfer a firearm to a person who is not a federally licensed firearms dealer unless before the transfer of the firearm, the dealer inquires of the applicant for purchase of the firearm whether that person has previously purchased a firearm and if the applicant answers the question in the affirmative, the dealer shall have the applicant sign a form under penalty of perjury that the applicant has previously purchased a firearm. Provides that upon signing that form, the dealer, after complying with all applicable federal, State, and local laws, rules, and ordinances, may transfer the firearm to the applicant. If the applicant answers the question in the negative, the dealer shall only transfer the firearm to the applicant if the dealer supplies to the applicant at the time of transfer of the firearm a brochure containing firearm safety information approved by the Department of State Police. Provides that a person who transfers a firearm to another person in which neither person is a federally licensed firearms dealer shall at the time of transfer of the firearm supply the transferee of the firearm a brochure containing firearm safety information approved by the Department of State Police. Provides that a violation is a Class A misdemeanor. Effective immediately.
Title
CRIM CD-FIREARM SAFETY
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-03-13 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-03-10 | Suspend Rule 25 - Prevailed 067-040-004 | |
2009-03-10 | Moved to Suspend Rule 25 Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie | |
2009-02-23 | Assigned to Executive Committee | |
2009-02-20 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Edward J. Acevedo | |
2009-02-19 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-02-19 | First Reading | |
2009-02-19 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2389&GAID=10&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=76&GA=96 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/96/HB/09600HB2389.htm |