IL HB2388 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-1)
Status: Passed on August 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-11 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0052
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Creates the Child Abuse Awareness Act. Contains only a short title provision.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CHILD ABUSE AWARENESS ACT-TECH

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-08-11HousePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0052
2017-08-11HouseEffective Date January 1, 2018
2017-08-11HouseGovernor Approved
2017-06-16HouseSent to the Governor
2017-05-19HousePassed Both Houses
2017-05-19SenateThird Reading - Passed; 054-000-000
2017-05-19SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2017-05-19SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2017-05-19SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison
2017-05-18SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt
2017-05-15SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 16, 2017
2017-05-15SenateSecond Reading
2017-05-12SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 15, 2017
2017-05-12SenateDo Pass Human Services; 010-000-000
2017-05-05SenateAssigned to Human Services
2017-05-02SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Scott M. Bennett
2017-05-02SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-05-02SenateFirst Reading
2017-05-02SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
2017-05-02SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2017-05-02SenateArrive in Senate
2017-04-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood
2017-04-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
2017-04-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
2017-04-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley
2017-04-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel J. Burke
2017-04-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
2017-04-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams
2017-04-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Cynthia Soto
2017-04-28HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 110-000-000
2017-04-26HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-04-26HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted
2017-04-26HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
2017-04-26HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-04-26HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
2017-04-25HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-04-25HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Anna Moeller
2017-04-25HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Human Services Committee; 009-000-000
2017-04-06HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Human Services Committee
2017-04-05HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-04-05HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Anna Moeller
2017-03-29HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond
2017-03-29HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-29HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 012-000-000
2017-03-29HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Human Services Committee; by Voice Vote
2017-03-28HouseMotion to Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed
2017-03-28HouseMotion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Human Services Committee; Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
2017-03-27HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Human Services Committee
2017-03-27HouseRe-assigned to Human Services Committee
2017-03-24HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-24HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Anna Moeller
2017-02-14HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2017-02-06HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-06HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-03HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Anna Moeller

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback