IL HB2386 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 21-3)
Status: Passed on July 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-19 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0090
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 21-3)
Status: Passed on July 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-19 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0090
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Provides that any person who commits a violation of the Section prohibiting the operation of an electronic communication device while operating a motor vehicle, and the violation results in an accident causing great bodily harm to any person, shall have his or her driver's license suspended for a period of one year and shall be assessed a fine of $1,000. Effective immediately.
Title
VEH CD-TEXTING BODILY HARM
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-16 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 18 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 82 N: 24 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 82 N: 24 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-19 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0090 |
2019-07-19 | House | Effective Date July 1, 2020 |
2019-07-19 | House | Governor Approved |
2019-06-14 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale Fowler |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachelle Crowe |
2019-05-16 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 041-000-000 |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jason Plummer |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 15, 2019 |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 7, 2019 |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Do Pass Transportation; 013-000-000 |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Assigned to Transportation |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-04-11 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Jil Tracy |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 11, 2019 |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2019-04-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello |
2019-04-10 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley |
2019-04-10 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin |
2019-04-10 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 082-024-002 |
2019-04-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli |
2019-04-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick |
2019-04-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ryan Spain |
2019-04-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed |
2019-04-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Amy Grant |
2019-04-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Randy E. Frese |
2019-04-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tim Butler |
2019-04-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles Meier |
2019-04-09 | House | Remove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles Meier |
2019-04-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Darren Bailey |
2019-04-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Avery Bourne |
2019-04-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsay Parkhurst |
2019-04-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie |
2019-04-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Terri Bryant |
2019-04-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. C.D. Davidsmeyer |
2019-04-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jeff Keicher |
2019-04-09 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John C. D'Amico |
2019-04-09 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-04-09 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted |
2019-04-09 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-04-09 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2019-04-05 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-04-05 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Norine K. Hammond |
2019-04-02 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles Meier |
2019-03-21 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-20 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2019-03-20 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; 008-004-000 |
2019-03-20 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee |
2019-03-19 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-19 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Norine K. Hammond |
2019-02-26 | House | Assigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee |
2019-02-13 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-13 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-13 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Norine K. Hammond |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
625 | 5 | 12-610.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |