IL HB2386 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on August 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-23 - Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Allen Skillicorn
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Environmental Protection Act. Provides that a person may sell or offer for sale at retail in the State any metal beverage container designed and constructed in such a manner that a part of the container is detachable in opening the container without the aid of a can opener if the part comprises substantially all of one of the ends of the metal beverage container.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

EPA-METAL BEVERAGE CONTAINERS

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-19 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-15 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-23HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Allen Skillicorn
2017-08-11HousePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0051
2017-08-11HouseEffective Date January 1, 2018
2017-08-11HouseGovernor Approved
2017-06-16HouseSent to the Governor
2017-05-19HousePassed Both Houses
2017-05-19SenateThird Reading - Passed; 054-000-000
2017-05-12SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 15, 2017
2017-05-12SenateSecond Reading
2017-05-04SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 5, 2017
2017-05-04SenateDo Pass Environment and Conservation; 005-000-000
2017-04-25SenateAssigned to Environment and Conservation
2017-03-16SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-03-16SenateFirst Reading
2017-03-16SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Chris Nybo
2017-03-16SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2017-03-16SenateArrive in Senate
2017-03-15HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock
2017-03-15HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 110-000-000
2017-03-09HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-09HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-08HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-07HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Tourism, Hospitality & Craft Industries Committee; 010-000-000
2017-02-14HouseAssigned to Tourism, Hospitality & Craft Industries Committee
2017-02-03HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-03HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-03HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Peter Breen

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
415521.2Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback