IL HB2382 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Department of State Police Law of the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois. Provides that the amendatory Act shall constitute an irrevocable continuing appropriation of all amounts necessary for the implementation the Department of State Police's Division of Forensic Services and the irrevocable and continuing authority for the Department and the State Treasurer to make the necessary transfers for that purpose. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

ST POLICE-FORENSIC SERVICES

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick
2019-03-29HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2019-03-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan
2019-02-26HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2019-02-13HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-02-13HouseFirst Reading
2019-02-13HouseChief Co-Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed
2019-02-13HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Deanne M. Mazzochi

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2026052605-40Amended CodeCitation Text
20260555a-4Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback